Accounts and annual returns WILD AT HEART FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161695
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 10 June 2022 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 10 June 2022 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 01 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 20 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 22 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 22 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 28 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window