Financial history WILD AT HEART FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161695
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £363.81k £501.49k £411.90k £514.20k £527.51k
Total expenditure £274.61k £524.77k £479.67k £377.57k £673.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £18.17k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £478.59k N/A £25.85k £556.85k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £27.00k £14.33k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £458.99k £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A £2.35k £1.33k
Income - Other N/A £22.90k N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £499.23k N/A £377.57k £673.08k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A £34.75k £53.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £25.54k N/A £0 £0