Trustees WILD AT HEART FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161695
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lorraine Anne Robertson Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Stephanie Camu Trustee 18 October 2021
None on record
Andrea Alessandro Davide Previ Trustee 02 December 2020
None on record
Jane Gottschalk Trustee 07 January 2019
None on record
NIKKI TIBBLES Trustee 15 May 2015
None on record