THE JULIE DIANE STEVENS MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Current activites - targeting and approaching local organisations with a view to donating needed funds within Oxfordshire. Current activities - looking into investments / savings / fundraising to build on the capital in order to donate to local organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 27 January 2015: Standard registration
- JSDMT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA FINNERON | Chair | 16 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT ROGERS | Trustee | 16 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £887 | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16/01/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FINANCE, GRANTS AND FUNDING TO ORGANISATIONS, SCHOOLS, UNIVERSITIES, COLLEGES FOR CHILDREN TO ENHANCE THEIR OPPORTUNITIES AND FURTHER EDUCATION. TO PROVIDE INDIVIDUAL GRANTS VIA ORGANISATIONS, SCHOOLS, UNIVERSITIES, COLLEGES FOR CHILDREN TO ENHANCE THEIR OPPORTUNITIES AND FURTHER EDUCATION. CHILDREN OF ALL AGES AND THEIR FAMILIES. KIDS AND YOUNG ADULTS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN OXFORDSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
131 Harvest Way
WITNEY
Oxfordshire
OX28 1AH
- Phone:
- 07825908562
- Email:
- jsdmemorialtrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window