BLAISE COMMUNITY GARDEN

Charity number: 1160376
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALASTAIR KENNETH RICHMOND BLACKWELL Trustee 15 February 2015
FRIENDS OF BLAISE Received: On time
Colin Marrs Trustee 10 January 2017 None on record
Neil Strover Holt Trustee 25 November 2015 None on record
Greg Ashdown-Hoare Trustee 12 November 2019 None on record
CHARLES WILLIAM CLAXTON Trustee 15 February 2015 None on record
Aimee-Rose New Trustee 12 February 2019 None on record
TIM PARKINSON Trustee 15 February 2015
HENBURY VILLAGE HALL Received: 4 days late
Sally Elizabeth Christine Brown Trustee 25 November 2015 None on record
KIM ASHDOWN Trustee 15 February 2015 None on record