Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF PORTLAND WORKS

Charity number: 1160641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window