NESS GARDENS - (AGNES LOIS BULLEY TRUST)

Charity number: 505721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To assist with the maintenance upkeep of Ness Gardens

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £343,512
Total expenditure: £380,859

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Knowsley
  • Liverpool City
  • Sefton
  • St Helens
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 November 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
UNIVERSITY OF LIVERPOOL Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £168.33k £166.56k £153.70k £345.21k £343.51k
Total expenditure £207.85k £198.53k £187.35k £374.07k £380.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 06 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 21 June 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 21 June 2024 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 16 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 22 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FOUNDATION BUILDING
765 BROWNLOW HILL
LIVERPOOL
L69 7ZX
Phone:
01517942107
Website:

nessgardens.org.uk