Accounts and annual returns EMPOWER THE GAMBIA

Charity number: 1161200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2022 10 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 10 February 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 28 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required