GWELFOR COMMUNITY CONCERN URBAN AID

Charity number: 505723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £24.39k £15.09k £20.09k £21.98k £40.90k
Total expenditure £27.85k £24.22k £24.05k £24.69k £18.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.50k £3.32k £3.08k £3.60k £3.60k