BARKING MAD DOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1160985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £147.43k £220.15k £284.83k £304.81k £291.01k
Total expenditure £132.70k £229.23k £278.92k £309.17k £287.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A