THE HARLEY JAE TRUST

Charity number: 1160377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £43.21k £87.04k £49.72k £30.41k £43.28k
Total expenditure £25.88k £60.65k £43.71k £36.74k £48.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A