PAINTER'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides two properties and is responsible for the upkeep of them. Apart from holding an annual meeting and other meetings as and when required, they enter into no other "activites".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 November 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY WEST | Chair | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Thompson | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen john Gallant | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STOBBS | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN STOCKDALE | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
HEDON TOWN COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.35k | £9.60k | £9.73k | £9.61k | £9.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.94k | £5.44k | £3.62k | £6.54k | £12.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5 JANUARY 1979
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF TWO ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS BEING RESIDENT IN HEDON.
Area of benefit
HEDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Orchard Court
Market Weighton
YORK
YO43 3QJ
- Phone:
- 07896354272
- Email:
- caroline@spgcja.karoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window