Accounts and annual returns CHRIST LADDER MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1163043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window