OCCUPATIONAL HYGIENE TRAINING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OHTA offers education, training and qualifications in Occupational/ Industrial Hygiene. Key activities are: * developing educational and training materials; * promoting good standards of training to ensure effective health protection; * creating a sustainable model for worldwide training delivery; * developing a qualifications framework that permits international transferability of skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Angola
- Australia
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Belgium
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Czech Republic
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Eswatini
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Kazakhstan
- Kuwait
- Laos
- Luxembourg
- Madagascar
- Malaysia
- Namibia
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Norway
- Oman
- Philippines
- Qatar
- Russia
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Singapore
- South Africa
- Switzerland
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Vietnam
- Zambia
Governance
- 11 August 2016: Standard registration
- OHTA (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sharann Heather Johnson | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter-John Jacobs | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Zalk | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Jimenez Saavedra | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucetta Weaver | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Fuller | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zack Mansdorf | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Angele Maurits Verpaele | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Leibowitz | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
LYNN O'DONNELL | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Chris Laszcz-Davis | Trustee | 13 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.01k | £53.63k | £67.21k | £78.33k | £90.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.38k | £49.91k | £60.83k | £81.99k | £65.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY’S OBJECT (THE “OBJECT”) IS TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY ADVANCING THE STUDY AND SCIENCE OF OCCUPATIONAL/INDUSTRIAL HYGIENE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ADS Accountancy Ltd
Unit 7
Faraday Court
Centrum One Hundred
BURTON-ON-TRENT
DE14 2WX
- Phone:
- 01332298101
- Email:
- team@ohtatraining.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window