S2 FOOD POVERTY NETWORK

Charity number: 1162137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 18 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 18 May 2016 On time Download