ASHDON JAZZ ACADEMY

Charity number: 1161413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 02 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 18 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 18 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 06 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 05 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 June 2017 On time Download