ASHDON JAZZ ACADEMY

Charity number: 1161413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £14.61k £4.77k £26.71k £31.08k £56.58k
Total expenditure £3.93k £8.78k £17.41k £32.46k £41.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A