ADOPTION UK CHARITY

Charity number: 1160647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.20m £1.77m £1.53m £1.47m £2.51m
Total expenditure £2.13m £1.72m £1.48m £1.59m £2.27m
Income from government contracts £0 £103.80k £105.70k £281.05k £176.47k
Income from government grants £465.05k £673.73k £632.71k £264.41k £553.08k
Income - Donations and legacies £100.87k £77.39k £49.10k £102.00k £149.26k
Income - Other trading activities £124.00k £36.76k £35.90k £37.13k £41.31k
Income - Charitable activities £1.62m £1.66m £1.45m £1.33m £2.31m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £54 £53 £90 £205 £1.37k
Income - Other £350.25k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.02m £1.63m £1.44m £1.50m £2.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £109.29k £87.10k £37.72k £88.22k £52.78k
Expenditure - Governance £28.58k £0 £0 £22.10k £19.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0