Trustees ADOPTION UK CHARITY

Charity number: 1160647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Victor REBEIRO Chair 04 September 2020
None on record
Siobhan Rhodes Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record
Daniella STUART Trustee 27 July 2022
None on record
Anuradha PAREKH Trustee 23 June 2022
None on record
Anju MAHBUBANI Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Anna JAQUES Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Jordina WALKER Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Dr Tony Eastwood Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Melissa Shackleton Trustee 28 March 2019
None on record
Wesley GRAHAM Trustee 20 September 2018
None on record