UBUNTU UNLEASHED

Charity number: 1163046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 23/07/2016 23/07/2017 23/07/2018 23/07/2019 23/07/2020
Total gross income £1.65k £1.80k £298 £522 £258
Total expenditure £1.25k £0 £4.92k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A