ORAL HEALTH AFRICA

Charity number: 1160829
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/01/2020
Total gross income £985 £1.86k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £12 £1.54k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A