COPDOCK AND WASHBROOK PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable access to the provision of sports, general health, recreational activities and wellbeing, together with social facilities, to the benefit of all of the general local communities by the maintenance of a playing field and sports pavilion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 February 2015: CIO registration
- 10 June 2015: Funds received from 304730 COPDOCK AND WASHBROOK PLAYING FIELD
- PFMC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Meakin | Chair | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr HENRY WILKINSON | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wilkinson | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN BASHAM | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN TAYLOR | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.45k | £5.45k | £6.15k | £4.04k | £5.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.18k | £3.18k | £6.51k | £1.96k | £4.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 26 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE ACCESS TO THE PROVISION OF SPORTS, GENERAL HEALTH , RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND WELLBEING TOGETHER WITH SOCIAL FACILITIES TO THE BENEFIT OF ALL THE GENERAL LOCAL COMMUNITIES BY THE MAINTENANCE OF A PLAYING FIELD AND SPORTS PAVILION
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 STOKE STREET
IPSWICH
IP2 8BZ
- Phone:
- 01473407762
- Email:
- mikey.lloyd.gb@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window