Accounts and annual returns HARROGATE RAILWAY JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1163279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 January 2019 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required