UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES INFORMATION SYSTEMS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1161218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of services to members in the education sector

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 April 2015: Standard registration
  • 09 July 2018: Funds received from 277747 UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES INFORMATION SYSTEMS ASSO...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • UCISA (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Simon Jon Corbett Trustee 19 June 2024
None on record
Iain McCracken Trustee 08 June 2023
None on record
Mark Johnston Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
Nathalie Czechowski Trustee 16 June 2022
None on record
Karen Bates Trustee 16 June 2022
None on record
Nicholas Kitt Gilbert Trustee 16 June 2022
None on record
James Daniel Crooks Trustee 16 June 2022
None on record
Matthew John Flower Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
Emma Jane Woodcock Trustee 10 June 2021
None on record
James Gordon Smith Trustee 10 June 2021
None on record
Sarah Beavon Trustee 11 June 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.22m £933.72k £938.05k £1.80m £2.19m
Total expenditure £1.86m £755.18k £754.48k £1.37m £1.81m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £722 N/A £2.17k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £604.78k £678.74k £717.16k £765.86k £882.11k
Income - Charitable activities £915.73k £248.68k £219.83k £1.01m £1.24m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13.43k £6.29k £349 £21.35k £64.37k
Income - Other £686.82k £0 £712 £0 £2.60k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £991.12k £256.34k £189.64k £752.42k £928.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds £871.88k £498.83k £564.85k £615.77k £884.84k
Expenditure - Governance £48.33k £40.28k £39.30k £0 £82.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £72.00k £56.58k £39.25k £32.39k £15.75k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.16m
Other assets £2.39m £3.34m £3.83m £4.06m £2.69m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £209.21k £961.62k £1.26m £1.04m £1.37m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Gravita Oxford LLP
First Floor
Park Central
40 - 41 Park End Street
Oxford
OX1 1JD
Phone:
01865 536702