Accounts and annual returns CATHOLIC AGENCY FOR OVERSEAS DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1160384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window