ST MICHAEL'S SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1160427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £29.63k £42.23k £31.08k £49.67k £15.41k
Total expenditure £31.14k £46.74k £23.48k £38.00k £38.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A