TERRIER SOS

Charity number: 1161484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £48.76k £30.11k £31.14k £31.89k £20.66k
Total expenditure £29.67k £34.69k £40.80k £28.79k £14.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A