RUTLAND MAGISTRATES FUND

Charity number: 505782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/04/2017 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020 06/04/2021
Total gross income £170 £173 £177 £180 £184
Total expenditure £160 £170 £180 £170 £190
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A