KENILWORTH CHRISTADELPHIAN CHURCH

Charity number: 1162702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.57k £13.58k £7.42k £12.87k £15.27k
Total expenditure £16.24k £19.77k £10.36k £19.33k £11.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A