OLD SARUM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1161414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 August 2016 On time Download