OLD SARUM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1161414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £43.65k £22.27k £22.49k £24.71k £28.70k
Total expenditure £23.42k £18.75k £17.45k £28.72k £23.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.50k £0 £1.00k N/A £1.00k