Financial history JOHN COCKERTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.14k £9.02k £9.08k £9.09k £9.26k
Total expenditure £15.87k £1.65k £5.79k £324 £16.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A