FRIENDS OF WILMSLOW HEALTH CENTRE CIO

Charity number: 1160341
Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF WHC (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARRY STAFFORD Trustee
None on record
ANGELA RAILTON Trustee
None on record
MARGARET MARY STRETFORD Trustee
None on record
MALI MACKENZIE Trustee
None on record
BARRY CAIDAN Trustee
None on record
STEPHEN MCDONNELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
No information available
Phone:
01625521231
Email:
No information available