Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHASETOWN

Charity number: 1160765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £97.79k £88.01k £83.18k £87.92k £154.40k
Total expenditure £82.56k £85.13k £90.77k £92.82k £99.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 £0 N/A N/A N/A