Accounts and annual returns LES PETITS CAMELEONS

Charity number: 1164264
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 July 2023 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 July 2023 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 August 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 07 August 2022 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 July 2020 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 July 2020 156 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 February 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 February 2019 9 days late Download Open in new window