LES PETITS CAMELEONS

Charity number: 1164264
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/05/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £32.67k £44.62k £50.55k £58.03k £62.37k
Total expenditure £31.98k £40.43k £43.75k £51.56k £67.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A