Financial history THORNTON LODGE ACTION GROUP

Charity number: 1161661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £93.23k £130.39k £110.20k £239.23k £222.34k
Total expenditure £94.30k £112.73k £107.01k £147.29k £174.42k
Income from government contracts £10.47k £29.48k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.47k £90.82k £102.17k £143.11k £36.52k