Accounts and annual returns EVERGREEN AFRICA

Charity number: 1160416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window