Financial history EVERGREEN AFRICA

Charity number: 1160416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £20.87k £22.32k £65.27k £51.48k £62.99k
Total expenditure £21.81k £21.48k £58.03k £39.93k £54.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A