GERMAN CHOIR OF LONDON

Charity number: 1162894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MELANIE ALLMENDINGER Chair 29 July 2015 None on record
Susanne Thiele Trustee 11 December 2018 None on record
Rebecca Dittrich Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
Richard Loeser Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
CHRISTIAN ANDERS Trustee 27 October 2016 None on record