AMOS TRUST

Charity number: 1164234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD ELLIOTT Trustee 03 November 2015
THE PICKWELL FOUNDATION Received: On time
DANIEL SCHUSTER-BEESLEY Trustee 12 July 2014 None on record
Robin Message Trustee 17 April 2018
THE AMOS TRUST Received: On time
Robert Andrew Howard Cohen Chair 31 January 2017 None on record
Jane Walker Trustee 28 November 2017
THE AMOS TRUST Received: On time
Madeleine McGivern Trustee 28 September 2016
THE AMOS TRUST Received: On time
Gemma Bell Trustee 28 September 2016
THE AMOS TRUST Received: On time