ZICHRON SHMUEL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objectives of the charity throughout the period has been: 1) The advancement of the orthodox Jewish faith; 2) The relief of poverty, sickness and infirmity amongst members of the Jewish faith and such other purposes as are charitable according to English Law; 3) The advancement of Morroccan orthodox Jewry through weekly communal prayer services, classes and gatherings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnet
Governance
- 11 May 2015: CIO registration
- ZICHRON SHMUEL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALBERT BENDAHAN | Chair | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JACQUES BENHAMOU | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
GLYN CLARK | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.26k | £13.11k | £11.39k | £8.37k | £11.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.31k | £15.56k | £10.18k | £8.94k | £16.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 397 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 397 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 763 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 763 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1128 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1128 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 18 April 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 18 April 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 May 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
HALLSWELLE HOUSE
1 HALLSWELLE ROAD
LONDON
NW11 0DH
- Phone:
- 07949292594
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window