THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LAMORBEY, THE HOLY REDEEMER

Charity number: 1160471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Church of England Parish

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £180,629
Total expenditure: £177,694

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bexley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 February 2015: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • HOLY REDEEMER, LAMORBEY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Melanie Jane Jemmett Chair 08 November 2017
None on record
Susan Ann Bunce Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Dorothy Winifred Donovan Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Margaret Rose Furlonger Trustee 23 April 2018
None on record
Anne Wallace Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
Peter Paul Louis Stevens Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
BRIAN AYTO Trustee 27 April 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £725.71k £114.16k £135.06k £176.06k £180.63k
Total expenditure £850.76k £144.74k £128.62k £164.70k £177.69k
Income from government contracts N/A £31.93k £43.95k £65.97k £45.67k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £643.02k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £20.12k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £62.26k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £312 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £850.57k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £191 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.70k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 November 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 November 2020 21 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
64 Days Lane
Sidcup
DA15 8JR
Phone:
020 8302 5356