THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE EDGBASTON BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1161342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £508.05k £749.99k £906.43k £1.10m £1.03m
Total expenditure £258.52k £929.99k £740.32k £1.05m £1.04m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £26.20k
Income - Donations and legacies £368.45k £652.50k £758.95k £860.54k £810.22k
Income - Other trading activities £40.42k £67.69k £68.53k £88.50k £16.77k
Income - Charitable activities £1.93k £8.66k £28.20k £97.90k £20.05k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.33k £9.92k £10.46k £11.27k £11.06k
Income - Other £88.92k £11.22k £40.30k £43.65k £169.71k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £258.52k £657.99k £740.32k £1.05m £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.30k
Expenditure - Governance £1.81k £1.70k £3.92k £6.80k £9.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £39.21k £55.92k £44.00k £60.50k £14.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £272.00k £0 £0 £0