Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE EDGBASTON BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1161342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tim Hughes Chair 06 September 2015
None on record
James Joseph Leavy Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
William John McKemey Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Keith Lumonga Kaselampao Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Mountford Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Lucy Jane Cavell Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Joshua James Wilson Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Sophie Jasmine Crewe Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Rev Michael Nicolas Darbandi Trustee 25 June 2022
None on record
Dr Nicholas John Harding Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Gavin Darman Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Dr Oliver Isaac Griffith Snelling Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Mamfuka Chilengwe Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Rev Dr Nicholas James Drake Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Rev Alison Elizabeth Herbert Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Rev Dr Katharine Victoria Hannah Stock Trustee 27 June 2021
None on record
Akhil Bakul Shah Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
James Bird Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Francis James Harper Trustee 29 April 2019
INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN FILMS LIMITED
Received: On time
KINGS CROSS CHURCH
Received: On time
Hannah Louise Miller Trustee 29 April 2019
KUJUWA INITIATIVE
Received: 33 days late
Dr Henry William Rattle Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Jonathan Rupert Mark Pearson Trustee 17 April 2016
THE REUBEN TRUST
Received: On time