Financial history SALISBURY CHAMBER CHORUS

Charity number: 1161010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £19.61k £14.44k £18.18k £10.85k £12.15k
Total expenditure £19.15k £13.37k £11.21k £9.21k £10.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A