TAKE HEART ( DERBY)

Charity number: 1163703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.66k £8.65k £9.06k £11.15k £6.31k
Total expenditure £5.60k £9.34k £9.35k £10.53k £5.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A