TAKE HEART ( DERBY)

Charity number: 1163703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET STORRY Trustee 11 May 2015
YEW TREE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time
MICHAEL BRIAN FLUDE Chair 12 May 2015 None on record
RICHARD JAMES FLATMAN Trustee 01 October 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. EDMUND,ALLESTREE Received: On time
ROBERT STEPHEN JONES Trustee 13 May 2013 None on record
Margit Staehr Trustee 09 July 2018 None on record
PATRICIA FLUDE Trustee 12 May 2015 None on record
PAMELA FEARN Trustee 13 May 2013 None on record