NAMIBIA PROJECT

Charity number: 1163681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 18 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 14 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 14 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 14 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 14 February 2018 On time Download