Accounts and annual returns THE VIRGIN MONEY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 30 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 08 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 08 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window